HI SB2618 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an owner to assign the renewable energy technologies income tax credit to a system seller or installer.
Title
Renewable Energy Technologies Income Tax Credit; Assignment of Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2320 (Same As) 2010-01-22 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2618&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2618_.HTM |