HI SB261 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB261
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the GoFarm Hawaii program. Requires GoFarm Hawaii to provide the chairperson of the board of agriculture with the program's annual goals and a semi-annual report outlining program outputs and outcomes.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-12-19 3:35PM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB261 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=261&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB261_.HTM |