HI SB2608 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to conduct a feasibility study of the potential revenue to be generated by limited gaming in the State and the potential public health and safety impacts of casino gambling. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Gambling.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | The recommendation was not adopted. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-08-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee on HWN has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-10-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-10-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:01PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM/JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |