HI SB2608 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of education to conduct annual self-evaluations, report a summary of its self-evaluations to the legislature, and post the summary on its public website.
Title
School Board; Self-Evaluation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 17 |
2016-02-16 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 12). |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-12-16. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2143) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2608&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2608_.HTM |