HI SB2605 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to retain independent counsel as needed whose legal fees are to be paid for by the State.
Title
Relating To Independent Legal Counsel.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:01PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |