HI SB2603 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to criteria and procedures in family court determinations regarding custody and visitation rights. Clarifies that a parent's felony conviction for a violent or sexual offense in which the victim was a minor, or requirement to register as a sex offender, raises a rebuttable presumption that custody or visitation by that parent is not in the best interest of the child. Requires courts to consider registration as a sex offender a presumption of risk that affects the burden of producing evidence. Requires courts to state reasons for findings in writing or on the record, including specific findings that there is no risk to the child's health, safety, and welfare. Effective 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Family Courts.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1131-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Say. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-13-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 291) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2962) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Best Interests
Custody and Visitation
Disclosure of Information
Family Courts
Murderers
Rebuttable Presumption
Sex Offenders
Significant Risk
Custody and Visitation
Disclosure of Information
Family Courts
Murderers
Rebuttable Presumption
Sex Offenders
Significant Risk