HI SB2603 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Executive Office on Early Learning for staffing and for travel by the Early Learning Advisory Board. (SD1)
Title
Executive Office on Early Learning; Early Learning Advisory Board; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2626) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:40AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2142) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2266 (Same As) 2016-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.