HI SB2602 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Procurement Policy Board to conduct annual compliance examinations of procurement contracts that are over $50,000 of an unspecified minimum number of executive departments, divisions, or agencies. Requires the State Procurement Policy Board to also select any department, division, or agency for a compliance examination to ensure compliance with the State Procurement Code. Requires the State Procurement Office to report its findings to the legislature. (SB2602 HD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 233) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2712) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2414) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 2:55PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |