HI SB2596 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to consult with appropriate bargaining units in establishing an evaluation program for teachers and educational officers, establishes that a teacher or educational officer is not responsible for the achievement of a student who is chronically absent, and prohibits a department of education evaluation program from affecting the compensation or employment status of any teacher or educational officer. Repeals provisions requiring a particular frequency and basis of evaluations.
Title
Department of Education; Teachers; Educational Officers; Evaluation Program
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2596&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2596_.HTM |