HI SB2595 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline by which the transfer of the Oahu regional health care system from the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to the Department of Health shall take place. Sets the manner by which the Oahu Regional Health Care System should request operational funding during the transitional period. Exempts the working group from chapter 92, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Appropriates moneys. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2490) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 1:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1579 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 150, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).