HI SB2594 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Classifies digital assets under the Uniform Commercial Code. Specifies the manner of perfecting a security interest in digital assets. Authorizes banks to hold digital assets in their custody. Authorizes courts to hear claims relating to digital assets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Digital Assets.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29SenateRe-Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback