HI SB2585 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies when pedestrians may enter a crosswalk equipped with a countdown timer. (SB2585 HD1)
Title
Pedestrian Walk Signals; Countdown Timers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:40PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 2:40PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; English Co-Chair; Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; LoPresti, Nakashima, Tupola. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 553). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1491-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-04-06 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2016-04-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-06-16 11:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 21 |
2016-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran). Transmitted to House. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-16. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2285) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, English, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRE. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |