HI SB2584 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the self-help housing trust fund and an advisory board to perform tasks necessary to prepare for the administration and operation of the trust fund. (SD1)
Title
Self-Help Housing; Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from EDH/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2222) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Fukunaga, Takamine. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Tsutsui, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH will hold a public decision making on 02-10-10 1:20pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL will hold a public decision making on 02-10-10 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 1:30pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDH/WTL, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |