HI SB2576 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 216, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 216, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a person convicted of committing the offense of prostitution to file a motion to vacate the conviction under certain circumstances. Establishes procedures for the motion to vacate. Establishes minimum fines for the commission of the first and any subsequent offense of prostitution. (CD1)
Title
Prostitution; Motion to Vacate Conviction
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | (S) Act 216, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). | |
2012-07-06 | (H) Act 216, on 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Ching voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 109-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 109-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Keith-Agaran, Har, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Keith-Agaran, Har Co-Chairs; Jordan, Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1577-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 4:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1309-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Herkes. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-22-12 2:45PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1068-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-15-12 10:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 229) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2235 (Same As) 2012-02-17 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5).