HI SB2576 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires new residential developments by the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation in school impact districts to be subject to all statutes, ordinances, charter provisions, and rules relating to school impact fees and school impact districts. Effective 07/01/2099.
Title
Housing Development Exemptions; School Impact Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 208) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2590) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2224) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Tsutsui; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Hemmings. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-10 1:20pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |