HI SB2568 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:45PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:45PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the return-to-home program to assist eligible homeless individuals return to their home state if there is a support network available and the support network is able to receive them. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB2568 HD2)
Title
Homeless; Return-to-Home Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 1:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-26-12 10:50AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 797). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ito, Mizuno, Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 461). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ching, Jordan, Morikawa, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Keith-Agaran voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1664-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kawakami, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-12 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ito, Chang, Coffman, Har, Kawakami, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Pine. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 227). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Deferred until 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from HMS/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2430) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan, Slom. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HMS/PGM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |