HI SB2567 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 2:00PM; Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 2:00PM; Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of Hawaiian home lands to digitize its applicant, beneficiary, and lessee records by creating an interactive digital database software program to be completed and available for use no later than 7/1/2023. Appropriates moneys. Effective 1/1/2222. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Native Hawaiian Beneficiaries.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 2:00PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 1:45PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 1:32PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Matayoshi, Todd Co-Chairs; Clark, Okimoto. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Moriwaki, Kanuha Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1812-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 254) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2794) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HWN/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2135) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Ihara. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Chang. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN/GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |