HI SB2567 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 132, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 132, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Cesspool Conversion Working Group within the Department of Health to develop a comprehensive plan for the conversion of all statewide cesspools by 2050. Requires the University of Hawaii to conduct a comprehensive statewide study of sewage contamination in nearshore marine areas. Appropriates funding to the Department of Health to conduct research or gather technical assistance and to the University of Hawaii for the study of sewage contamination in nearshore marine areas. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 132, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 132, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 36-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 36-18). |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Keohokalole; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, McDermott. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 813). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator English added as Co-Chair. Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 789). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Dela Cruz added as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Mizuno, Lowen Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 512). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1938-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1460-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-22-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-21-18 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-18 at 10:30 AM in room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 03-20-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1189-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHS. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 218) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2600) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 02-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2029) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Nishihara. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Cesspool Conversion Working Group
Statewide Study Of Sewage Contamination In Nearshore Marine Areas
Cesspool Conversion Working Group
Statewide Study Of Sewage Contamination In Nearshore Marine Areas