HI SB2566 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 675).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 675).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a physician or surgeon may conduct diagnostic testing or engage in a one-time consultation for a subspecialty diagnostic evaluation and treatment recommendations from a board-certified or licensed specialist. Allows for the one-time consultation to be referred to a board-certified or licensed specialist working in a facility in which a physician or surgeon may have a financial interest. (CD1)
Title
Medical and Rehabilitation Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 675). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 437). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Finnegan, Marumoto voting no (2) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 21 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Ige. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Deferred to Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-22-10. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday 04-22-10. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 58-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 58-10). | |
2010-04-16 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Herkes, Yamashita, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-16-10 3:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-13-10 4:45PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Herkes, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Pine. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 431). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Finnegan, Marumoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Bertram, Hanohano excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1208-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Sagum. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Mizuno. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-17-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Berg, McKelvey, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Souki, Pine. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-09-10 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 203). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from LBR/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2382) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Bunda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to LBR/HTH. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |