HI SB2563 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC .
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC .
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of all flavored tobacco products. Establishes fines and penalties for violations. Effective 01/01/2023.
Title
Relating To Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC . |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1698 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2563&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2563_.HTM |