HI SB2559 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 234, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 234, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum requirements for emergency shelters. Requires homeless shelter stipends to be paid for achievement of performance measures. Repeals the automatic annual adjustment of homeless shelter stipend amounts. Revises existing provisions on the establishment and collection of shelter and service payments from homeless families and individuals. Requires homeless service provider agencies to submit a financial audit to the Department of Human Services at least annually. (CD1)
Title
Homeless Shelters; Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 234, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2016-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 234, 07/11/2016, (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 120-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 120-16). |
2016-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Jordan; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 10:35AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Luke Co-Chairs; Jordan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Harimoto Co-Chair; Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 486). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1606-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 04-05-16 at 2:30PM. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1223-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-21 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-22-16 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 194) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2732) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-29-16 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |