HI SB2558 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Re-Referred to EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Re-Referred to EET, JDC.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a one-mile setback from the nearest existing farm dwelling or residential dwelling unit for wind energy facilities in agricultural districts.
Title
Relating To Wind Energy Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2188 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2558&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2558_.HTM |