HI SB2556 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act 059, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act 059, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Industrial Hemp Special Fund within the Department of Agriculture to deposit fees and expend funds necessary for the Industrial Hemp Pilot Program. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Act 059, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160). |
2018-06-29 | House | Act 059, on 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 94-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 94-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 10:02AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 828). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Cachola, Thielen. |
2018-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 555). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 411). |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1823-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6). |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1270-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ing, Say. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 213) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2727) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2005) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |