HI SB2554 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates that all new single-family residential home construction shall be net zero capable by 2015.
Title
Energy Efficiency; New Single Family Residential Construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-23-10 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 02-19-10 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-18-10 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-10 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to ENE/EDH. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2554&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2554_.HTM |