HI SB2551 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires transient accommodations operators to provide training, signage, and reporting policies to employees regarding human trafficking awareness.
Title
Relating To Human Trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 02-07-20 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 2:55PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EET/LCA, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2551&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2551_.HTM |