HI SB2551 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 166, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 166, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the judiciary to submit an annual report to the legislature on the judiciary's management of non-general funds and administratively created accounts or funds. (CD1)
Title
Judiciary; Non-general Funds; Administratively Created Accounts or Funds; Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Act 166, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268). |
2016-06-30 | House | Act 166, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 124-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 124-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Jordan, Kawakami; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-16 1:55PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689). |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Shimabukuro. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Jordan Co-Chairs; Kawakami, McDermott. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Deferred until 04-19-16. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 483). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1592-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1212-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Morikawa, Woodson. |
2016-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-18-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2564) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2190) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |