HI SB2550 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the HHFDC to enter into public private partnerships with private sector entities to build affordable housing and reserves a portion of the housing units for the exclusive use of the employees of the private sector entity partner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Affordable Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28SenateThe committee on HOU deferred the measure.
2020-01-24SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2182 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback