HI SB2549 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the liquor commission to reduce submission requirements for the issuance of temporary licenses for the sale of liquor for a period not to exceed one day for fundraising events by nonprofit organizations. Permits nonprofit organizations that have been issued a temporary liquor license for a fundraising event the ability to auction off, at a live or silent auction, liquor in sealed or covered containers or services that provide liquor. Removes, from the list of factors the liquor commission may consider when deciding on a previously denied, refused, or withdrawn liquor license application, language that allows any other considerations deemed by the liquor commission to affect the application, issuance, or exercise of a liquor license. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Liquor Licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 212) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) K. Rhoads). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2587) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2414 (Same As) 2018-07-05 - Act 092, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).