HI SB2541 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
When identifying a replacement vehicle or cash settlement value, requires an insurer to take into consideration costs of shipping the vehicle and the insured's travel for pre-purchase inspection of the replacement vehicle, if not on the same island, and, if the insured vehicle is an electric vehicle, the remaining battery life and capacity of the vehicle's primary battery, known as the traction battery pack, which shall have equal or greater weight than mileage on the vehicle.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Valuation.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1898 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2541&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2541_.HTM |