HI SB254 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB254
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation to coordinate with other state agencies to develop lands owned or administered by the State within one mile of transit station sites. Requires that developments on parcels or groups of contiguous parcels of state land with an area of at least ten acres include a certain percentage of affordable housing units reserved for residents or families at specific income levels. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 455) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Nishihara. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ETT/WTL/HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB254 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.