HI SB2530 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a system under the department of commerce and consumer protection to collect, analyze and distribute health insurance claims information.
Title
Hawaii Healthcare Claims Uniform Reporting and Evaluation System
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2530&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2530_.HTM |