HI SB2519 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Agribusiness Development Corporation to enter into contracts with private businesses to remove select municipal solid waste, glass, and food and green waste from the waste stream for use in other business sectors, including agriculture, construction, and energy production; provided the contracts benefit agricultural and agriculture-related projects. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1255). |
2018-07-10 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1255). |
2018-06-25 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-18 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 28-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 28-18). |
2018-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Creagan, Cullen, Lowen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Creagan, Cullen Co-Chairs; Lowen, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 511). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1937-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ing. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1190-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-15-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 428) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-18. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report filed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 9 offered. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2697) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Record of Vote for WAM on 2/13/2018 corrected to reflect 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2067) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |