HI SB2517 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires appointments and selections of heads of state divisions and agencies that require a board approval to be made through a publicly established process and timeline. Requires the approval of the process and timeline to appoint or select a new head of a division or agency to be determined in an open meeting. Requires that votes to appoint or select a head of state divisions and agencies to be conducted in an open meeting. Provides that any vote to appoint or select a head of a state division or agency cast in violation of the foregoing shall be invalid. Requires that a vote by a board to appoint or select hire a head of a division or agency be conducted in an open meeting. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Agency Meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2632) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Awa. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee on GVO will reconsider its previous decision made on 02-06-24 and will hold a public decision making on 02-13-24 3:29PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-06-24 3:05PM; CR 225. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appointment
Head of a State Division or Agency
Open Deliberation
Open Meeting
Public Agency Meetings and Records
Selection
Sunshine Law
Voting
Head of a State Division or Agency
Open Deliberation
Open Meeting
Public Agency Meetings and Records
Selection
Sunshine Law
Voting