HI SB2516 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to adopt rules to designate areas where, and time periods during which, commercial watersports equipment may be operated. Prohibits persons from using commercial watersports equipment without a use permit issued by DLNR. Requires a permittee to pay fees to DLNR for a use permit for commercial watersports equipment. Requires DLNR to conduct an annual review of the use permits issued for commercial watersports equipment. Defines "commercial watersports equipment."
Title
DLNR; Use Permits; Commercial Watersports Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-14-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/WLH, CPN/WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDT/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2403 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 7
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2516 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2516_.HTM |