HI SB2508 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a nexus standard for taxing out-of-state businesses on their business activities in Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 201) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2642) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-18 9:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM/JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |