HI SB2501 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "variance" under water pollution statutes. Prohibits permits to be issued for continuing discharge of point source pollution into highest quality waters, except for temporary construction. Allows the director to grant a variance pursuant to chapter 342D. Provides that in all variance proceedings the burden of proof is on the applicant. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Water Pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2636) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |