HI SB25 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB25
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Re-referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 25
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Re-referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 25
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits minors to consent to medical care related to the diagnosis or treatment of HIV or the prevention of HIV. Provides that a minor, under certain circumstances, shall not be liable for payment for treatment or prevention of HIV. Authorizes physician assistants, in addition to physicians and advanced practice registered nurses, to render medical care and services to minors. Effective 5/6/2137. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Medical Care For Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Re-referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 141) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-17-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Re-referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 25
HB478 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB478 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1