HI SB2494 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates requirements for apprenticeship and licensure of elevator mechanics, including examination, license renewal, continuing education, scope of work, exemptions, remote interaction, and qualifications for licensure. Clarifies powers and duties of the Elevator Mechanics Licensing Board and requirements for temporary permits. (SB2494 HD2)
Title
Relating To Elevator Mechanics.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 510). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1919-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Holt, Todd. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno, McDermott. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1164-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole. |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-13-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 194) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2679) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2149) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-06-18 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-02-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1630 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).