HI SB249 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB249

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the President of the University of Hawaii from serving concurrently as a campus chancellor. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The President Of The University Of Hawaii System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2023-02-10SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2023-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
2023-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
2023-01-27SenateRe-Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM.
2023-01-23SenateReferred to HRE, JDC.
2023-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB249 (Carry Over) 2023-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback