HI SB2488 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 161, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 161, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Medical Cannabis Insurance Reimbursement Working Group to address the complexities surrounding the topic of making medical cannabis reimbursable by health insurance. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 161, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 161, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1270). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 13-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 13-18). |
2018-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-18 11:00am in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-18 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 486). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403). |
2018-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2018-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6). |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1263-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-14-18 8:40AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2698) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2483) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2741 (Same As) 2018-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).