HI SB2479 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Justice League Program to provide loan repayments on behalf of eligible lawyers that pursue public interest work in Hawaii. Provides for loan repayments by the University of Hawaii William S. Richardson School of Law. Creates the Hawaii Justice League Revolving Fund. Makes an appropriation. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
Relating To Access To Justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2656 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2479&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2479_.HTM |