HI SB2477 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the penalty for nonreporting of child abuse or neglect from a petty misdemeanor to a class C felony.
Title
Relating To Nonreporting On Child Abuse.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2123) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2429 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2477&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2477_.HTM |