HI SB2476 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HLT, IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HLT, IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes naturopathic physicians with the same authority as physicians and advanced practice registered nurses in regards to providing written certifications to qualified patients for the medical use of cannabis. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3173) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2595) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1797 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Quinlan, Todd, Ward voting no (12) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).