HI SB247 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts voting by mail uniformly across all counties for all elections commencing in 2020. Establishes a limited number of voter service centers, with a minimum of two on each island with a population over 75,000, that would remain open from the tenth business day preceding an election through the day of the election to receive personal delivery of mail-in ballots, accommodate voters with special needs, offer same day registration and voting, and provide other election services. Allows for additional places of deposit for personal delivery of mail-in ballots. Appropriates funds for the implementation and administration of the election by mail program. Requires the office of elections to submit a report to the legislature prior to the convening of each regular session from 2020 through 2025, regarding the implementation of a vote by mail system. Takes effect on 1/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB247 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=247&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB247_.HTM |