HI SB247 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires recounts of election votes when the margin of victory is less than two hundred fifty votes or less than one per cent of the votes cast, whichever is less. Takes effect on 01/07/59. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 105) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 101) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 8:45AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB247 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1364 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1364 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6