HI SB2462 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, by September 1, 2020, that the department of health request the Drug Enforcement Administration to grant a federal schedule I exemption for the medical use of cannabis in Hawaii.
Title
Relating To Controlled Substances.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2462&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2462_.HTM |