HI SB2460 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to address the mental health and wellness needs of youth in the State.
Title
Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2369) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 02-07-24 1:00PM; CR 225. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:55PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2042 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Act 102, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203).