HI SB2460 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to TEC/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to TEC/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the deployment of 5G in the State until a definitive research base exists finding that 5G poses no significant public health hazard.
Title
Relating To 5g.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to TEC/CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TEC, CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2460&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2460_.HTM |