HI SB2458 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for FY 2014-2015 for the department of agriculture's biosecurity program.
Title
Biosecurity Program; Department of Agriculture; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from AGL/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2314) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-14 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AGL/ENE, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1932 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2458&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2458_.HTM |