HI SB2454 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Re-Referred to EET/PSM, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Re-Referred to EET/PSM, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the installation of photovoltaic energy systems in all new residential construction, beginning January 1, 2025. Allows for variances to be issued by the chief energy officer of the Hawaii state energy office.
Title
Relating To Photovoltaic Energy Systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/PSM, CPH/WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM, CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2454&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2454_.HTM |